+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2016 in the Council:
- Law L21-0094 Effective from Apr 6, 2016, Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 6501
On February 26, 2016 in the Council:
- Act A21-0315 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 2201
On February 24, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On February 19, 2016 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 18, 2016 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A21-0315
- Enacted with Act Number A21-0315
On February 9, 2016 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 24, 2016
On February 2, 2016 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On February 1, 2016 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On January 5, 2016 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On December 15, 2015 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B21-0134
On November 19, 2015 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B21-0134
On October 9, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 20, 2015 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0134 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 17, 2015 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2015 in the Council:
- B21-0134 Introduced by Councilmember Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2016: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
January 5, 2016: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor