+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0554 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 256, Expires on Mar 31, 2019
On December 31, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0554, Expires on Mar 31, 2019
- Signed with Act Number A22-0554, Expires on Mar 31, 2019
On December 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 10, 2019
On December 18, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Retained by the Council
On December 13, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-1062 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
December 18, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor