+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 14, 2018 in the Council:
- Act A22-0529 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13433, Expires on Mar 10, 2019
On December 10, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0529, Expires on Mar 10, 2019
- Returned from Mayor
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0529, Expires on Mar 10, 2019
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 18, 2018
On November 27, 2018 in the Council:
- Final Reading
On November 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- B22-1039 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
November 27, 2018: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor