+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council
On March 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Act A20-0005 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 2792, Expires on May 1, 2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On January 31, 2013 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0005, Expires on May 1, 2013
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0005, Expires on May 1, 2013
On January 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 5, 2013
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Final ReadingÂ
On January 3, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0001 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
January 8, 2013: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor