+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0553
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0553
On December 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 30, 2014
On December 2, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On December 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Second Reconsideration
- First Reconsideration
- First Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0955
On October 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0955 View Video :
On October 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0955 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On October 2, 2014 in the Council:
- B20-0955 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (4)
December 2, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
November 18, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: First Reconsideration
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: Second Reconsideration
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor