+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 12, 2023
On December 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 30, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0950
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0950 View Public Hearing Record
On September 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On July 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0950 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 14, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0950 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, Henderson, Nadeau, Allen, Lewis George, Bonds, Gray, and Pinto at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 20, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: No
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: No