+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0949 View Public Hearing Record
On September 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0949
On September 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On August 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On August 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On August 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0949 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 14, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0949 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor