+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0548 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009991, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
On July 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 27, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0548, Expires on Oct 25, 2022
On July 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 04, 2022
On July 12, 2022 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On July 6, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0927 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
July 12, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor