+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0450 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 007758, Expires on Sep 26, 2022
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0450, Expires on Sep 26, 2022
- Returned from Mayor
On June 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 28, 2022
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On May 31, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0827 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 7, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor