+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On September 22, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0824
On September 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0824 View Public Hearing Record
On June 10, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0824 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities, Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee of the Whole
On May 24, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0824 Introduced by Councilmembers R. White, Allen, Henderson, Pinto, Silverman, Gray, Lewis George, and Nadeau at Office of the Secretary