+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 12, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0807 View Public Hearing Record
- Public Hearing on B24-0807
- Public Hearing on B24-0807
- Public Hearing on B24-0807
On December 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 2, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 25, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 17, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0807 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment, Committee on Labor and Workforce Development, and Committee of the Whole with comments from the Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
On May 2, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0807 Introduced by Councilmembers Lewis George, Nadeau, Henderson, R. White, Pinto, Bonds, and T. White at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (5)
Lewis George
Type:
Primary Sponsor