+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 31, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0556
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0556
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015
On December 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson)
On December 2, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0805
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0805
On November 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 13, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0805
On November 5, 2014 in the Council:
- Oversight Hearing on B20-0805 View Video :
On October 31, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Oversight Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Oversight Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on B20-0805 View Video :
- Roundtable Hearing on B20-0805 View Video :
On July 23, 2014 in the Council:
- Roundtable Hearing on B20-0805 View Video :
On July 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Roundtable Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0805
On June 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0805 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations, Committee on Economic Development, Committee on Finance and Revenue, and Committee of the Whole
On May 23, 2014 in the Council:
- B20-0805 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (3)
December 17, 2014: Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
December 17, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
December 2, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor