+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0032 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 003185, Expires on Jun 15, 2021
On March 22, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 17, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0032, Expires on Jun 15, 2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 23, 2021
On March 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On February 16, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0079 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
March 2, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor