+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0424 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006235, Expires on Aug 21, 2022
On May 24, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0424, Expires on Aug 21, 2022
On May 16, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 31, 2022
On May 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On April 25, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0786 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 3, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor