+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Mendelson)
On December 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 2, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0720
On May 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0720
On April 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0720 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
- B20-0720 Introduced by Councilmember Graham at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (3)
December 17, 2014: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
December 17, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
December 2, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor