+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0515 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 10374
On December 12, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0515
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0515
- Returned from Mayor
On December 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 15, 2014
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Oral Amendment (Mendelson, Catania)
- Amendment (Mendelson)
On October 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Cheh)
- First Reading
On October 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Postponed to 10/28/14
On October 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0715
On May 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0715
On March 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0715 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B20-0715 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (6)
November 18, 2014: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
November 18, 2014: Oral Amendment (Mendelson, Catania)
- Yeas: 13
November 18, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
October 28, 2014: Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Cheh)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
October 28, 2014: First Reading
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
October 7, 2014: Postponed to 10/28/14
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1