+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0552
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0552
- Returned from Mayor
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015
On December 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading CC
On December 2, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On November 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0710
On October 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0710
On September 26, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0710 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
- B20-0710 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds, Barry, and McDuffie at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
December 17, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
December 2, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12