+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12725
On December 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0511
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0511
On November 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Second Reconsideration
- First Reconsideration
- Final Reading
On November 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 28, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0708
On July 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On July 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0708
On May 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0708
On April 25, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0708 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Economic Development and Committee of the Whole
- B20-0708 Introduced by Councilmember Bowser at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (4)
November 18, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: First Reconsideration
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: Second Reconsideration
- Yeas: 13
October 28, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1