+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0707 View Public Hearing Record
On September 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published.
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0707 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On March 10, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0707 Introduced by Councilmembers Lewis George, Nadeau, Allen, R. White, T. White, Pinto, and Bonds at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (5)
Lewis George
Type:
Primary Sponsor