+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0674 View Public Hearing Record
On March 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0674 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On February 18, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0674 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, Lewis George, Nadeau, R. White, and Allen at Office of the Secretary