+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 12, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0495 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12565
On December 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0495
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0495
On November 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014
On November 18, 2014 in the Council:
- Second Reconsideration
- First Reconsideration
- Final Reading CC
On October 28, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On October 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0673
On July 9, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0673 View Video :
On June 20, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0673 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
- B20-0673 Introduced by Councilmember Orange at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (4)
November 18, 2014: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: First Reconsideration
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
November 18, 2014: Second Reconsideration
- Yeas: 13
October 28, 2014: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1