+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 2, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0655 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014691
On November 22, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On November 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0655
On November 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 21, 2022
On October 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On September 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On September 27, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On September 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0668
On September 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0668
- Public Hearing on B24-0668
On April 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment with comments from the Committee on Business and Economic Development
On April 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 25, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0668 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Re-Referral published.
On March 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On February 17, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0668 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
October 18, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
October 4, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor