+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 12, 2023
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0666
- Legislative Meeting
On October 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On October 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0666
On October 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On May 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0666
- Public Hearing on B24-0666
On April 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 25, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0666 Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Re-Referral published.
On March 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 16, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0666 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
+ − Votes (3)
December 6, 2022: Mendelson Amendment
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Absent
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
November 15, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Absent
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor