+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0066
- Legislative Meeting
On October 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On October 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0066
On October 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0066 View Public Hearing Record
On July 16, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 14, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0066
On July 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 16, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee of the Whole
On February 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0066 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 4, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0066 Introduced by Councilmembers Henderson, Lewis George, Nadeau, Cheh, Pinto, and R. White at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 20, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes