+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0657 View Public Hearing Record
On June 10, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 9, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0657 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On February 9, 2022 in the Council:
- B24-0657 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor