+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0576
On February 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Withdrawn
On January 31, 2014 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 29, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0576 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On November 14, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0576 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor