+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 17, 2014 in the Council:
- Law Number L20-0142 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
On September 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 17, 2014
On August 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0385 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8045
On July 31, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On July 29, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0385
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0385
On July 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 4, 2014
On July 14, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Cheh)
On June 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Amendment (Cheh)
- Amendment (Grosso)
- First Reading, CC
On June 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On June 16, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0573
On March 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 19, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0573
On January 8, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0573
On December 20, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 6, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 29, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0573 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On November 6, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0573 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (5)
July 14, 2014: Amendment (Cheh)
- Yeas: 13
July 14, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
June 24, 2014: Amendment (Cheh)
- Yeas: 13
June 24, 2014: Amendment (Grosso)
- Yeas: 13
June 24, 2014: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor