+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0566 View Public Hearing Record
On February 11, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On December 24, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0566 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 21, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On December 16, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0566 Introduced by Councilmembers Nadeau, Cheh, Henderson, Allen, Pinto, Bonds, Lewis George, McDuffie, R. White, Silverman, Gray, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor