+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 23, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 22, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0545
On December 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 24, 2020
On December 1, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 9, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0548
On July 30, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0548 View Public Hearing Record
On July 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 19, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 12, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On November 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0548 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On November 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B23-0548 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, Nadeau, Bonds, T. White, Grosso, Todd, and R. White at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (2)
December 1, 2020: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
November 17, 2020: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- David Grosso: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brandon Todd: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes