+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0099 Effective from Apr 30, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 5190
On March 5, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Apr 30, 2014
On February 28, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0281 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 1594
On February 21, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 20, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0281
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0281
On February 10, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 25, 2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
On February 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On January 7, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading, CC
On December 17, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0525
On November 14, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0525
On October 25, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0525 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 15, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On October 10, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0525 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
January 7, 2014: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor