+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 12, 2023 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B25-0005
On September 22, 2023 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 19, 2023 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On January 17, 2023 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations
On January 13, 2023 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0005 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 3, 2023 in the Council:
- B25-0005 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor