+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0496
On January 31, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 24, 2020 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 18, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0496 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 8, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Education, and Committee of the Whole
- B23-0496 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, T. White, Bonds, Nadeau, Grosso, Cheh, and R. White at Legislative Meeting
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor