+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Law L24-0152, Effective from Aug 16, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011398
On July 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On July 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0443 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 007730
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0443
- Returned from Mayor
On June 13, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 28, 2022
On June 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On May 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On April 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On April 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Mark-up on B24-0444
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0444
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On January 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0444 View Public Hearing Record
- Public Hearing on B24-0444
On December 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On December 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On December 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 22, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0444 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On October 13, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0444 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, and Allen at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
May 3, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor