+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0433 View Public Hearing Record
- Public Hearing on B24-0433
On October 7, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 4, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On July 29, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 22, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0433 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On October 6, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0433 Introduced by Councilmembers Henderson, and Pinto at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor