+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 18, 2022 in the Council:
- Law L24-0072, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002016
On January 14, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0268 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000186
On January 11, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On January 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0268
- Returned from Mayor
On December 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 05, 2022
On December 7, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On November 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On October 25, 2021 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On October 21, 2021 in the Council:
- Mark-up on B24-0043
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0043
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On April 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0043 View Public Hearing Record
- Public Hearing on B24-0043
- Public Hearing on B24-0043
On April 9, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 1, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On March 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 5, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0043 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On January 25, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0043 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 7, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
November 2, 2021: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor