+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 20, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On December 19, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 6, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0429
- Legislative Meeting
On September 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed, Includes Hearing Record
On September 27, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On September 26, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0429
On September 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
On February 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0429 View Public Hearing Record
On January 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 21, 2022 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On October 22, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0429 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee of the Whole with comments from the Committee on Business and Economic Development
On October 4, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0429 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, R. White, Nadeau, McDuffie, Henderson, Cheh, Bonds, Lewis George, Pinto, and Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
December 20, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
December 6, 2022: First Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor