+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On October 28, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0405 View Public Hearing Record
On October 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On July 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0405 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 12, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0405 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson, and Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor