+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0135 Effective from Sep 9, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 9968
On July 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0365 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6767
On June 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Sep 9, 2014
On June 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 23, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0365
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0365
On June 16, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 30, 2014
On June 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading
- Amendment (Cheh) - Accepted as a friendly
On May 6, 2014 in the Council:
- First Reading
- Amendment In Nature of Substitute (Cheh)
On May 1, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On April 15, 2014 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0368
On January 2, 2014 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0368
On November 29, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On July 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0368 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 26, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B20-0368 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, Grosso, McDuffie, and Wells at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (4)
June 3, 2014: Amendment (Cheh) - Accepted as a friendly
- Yeas: 13
June 3, 2014: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
May 6, 2014: Amendment In Nature of Substitute (Cheh)
- Yeas: 13
May 6, 2014: First Reading
- Yeas: 13