+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 28, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A23-0065 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7604, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
On June 20, 2019 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On June 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0065, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
On June 7, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 21, 2019
On June 4, 2019 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Facilities and Procurement
On May 28, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0313 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
June 4, 2019: Final Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor