+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Law L24-0144, Effective from Jul 22, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009775
On June 8, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On June 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Act A24-0435 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 006261
On May 24, 2022 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 23, 2022 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0435
On May 16, 2022 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 31, 2022
On May 3, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On April 5, 2022 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On March 16, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On March 15, 2022 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B24-0302
On October 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B24-0302 View Public Hearing Record
On September 10, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On September 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing filed in the Office of Secretary
On June 18, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0302 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On June 15, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On June 10, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0302 Introduced by Councilmember Lewis George at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2022: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
April 5, 2022: First Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Lewis George
Type:
Primary Sponsor