+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0025 View Video :
On March 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0025 View Video :
On February 1, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0025 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- B20-0025 Introduced by Councilmembers Bonds, Bowser, Grosso, and Cheh at Legislative Meeting
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor