+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Law Number L22-0225 Effective from Feb 22, 2019
On January 11, 2019 in the Council:
- Act A22-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 191
On January 9, 2019 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On December 28, 2018 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On December 26, 2018 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A22-0538
- Enacted with Act Number A22-0538
On December 13, 2018 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 28, 2018
On December 4, 2018 in the Council:
- Final reading CC
On November 20, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On November 13, 2018 in the Council:
- First Reading CC
On October 16, 2018 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B22-0234
On July 2, 2018 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B22-0234
On June 15, 2018 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 7, 2017 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0234 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 4, 2017 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
- B22-0234 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (2)
December 4, 2018: Final reading CC
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
November 13, 2018: First Reading CC
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor