+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 3, 2014 in the Council:
- Tabled indefinitely
On May 6, 2014 in the Council:
- Tabled Time Certain to 6/3/14 Legislative Meeting
On February 4, 2014 in the Council:
- Tabled Time Certain to 5/6/14 Legislative Meeting
On January 7, 2014 in the Council:
- On Legislative Agenda - Not Considered
On December 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On December 16, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0022
On March 11, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0022 View Video :
On February 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 18, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0022 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On January 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
- B20-0022 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Legislative Meeting
+ − Votes (4)
June 3, 2014: Tabled indefinitely
- Yeas: 13
May 6, 2014: Tabled Time Certain to 6/3/14 Legislative Meeting
- Yeas: 13
February 4, 2014: Tabled Time Certain to 5/6/14 Legislative Meeting
- Yeas: 13
January 7, 2014: On Legislative Agenda - Not Considered
- Yeas: 13