+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Law L23-0098, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8039
On May 5, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On April 10, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0268 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3923
On April 2, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On March 26, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0268
On March 13, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Mar 27, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On February 4, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On February 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
On January 21, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0215
On November 12, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0215 View Public Hearing Record
On November 1, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On October 25, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 2, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole with comments from the Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
On March 29, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0215 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 21, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0215 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2020: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
March 3, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
February 4, 2020: Amendment (Mendelson)
- Yeas: 12
February 4, 2020: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor