+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On July 1, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referral published.
On June 28, 2022 in the Council:
- Re-Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
On April 23, 2021 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0210 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On April 20, 2021 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and Committee on Business and Economic Development
On April 8, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0210 Introduced by Councilmember McDuffie at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor