+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0187
On May 24, 2019 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B23-0187
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On May 17, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Health
On March 15, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0187 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 5, 2019 in the Council:
- B23-0187 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor