+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005817, Expires on Aug 23, 2021
On May 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On May 25, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0080, Expires on Aug 23, 2021
On May 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- Legislative Meeting
On March 16, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0154 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
May 4, 2021: Final Reading
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor