+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2014 in the Council:
- Law L20-0094 Effective from Mar 14, 2014, Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 3749
On February 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Act A20-0271 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 963
On January 30, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 14, 2014
On January 24, 2014 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On January 23, 2014 in the Council:
- Signed with Act Number A20-0271
- Enacted with Act Number A20-0271
On January 13, 2014 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 28, 2014
On January 7, 2014 in the Council:
- Final Reading, CC
- Committee Report Filed
On December 3, 2013 in the Council:
- First Reading
On November 19, 2013 in the Council:
- Committee Mark-up of B20-0152
On October 22, 2013 in the Council:
- Public Hearing on B20-0152
On October 4, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 8, 2013 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0152 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On March 5, 2013 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2013 in the Council:
- B20-0152 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
January 7, 2014: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
December 3, 2013: First Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor