+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 24, 2020 in the Council:
- Law L23-0113, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8974
On May 15, 2020 in the Council:
- Act A23-0305 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5069
On May 12, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Congress
On May 5, 2020 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On April 27, 2020 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0305
On April 17, 2020 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 01, 2020
On April 7, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On March 3, 2020 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On January 28, 2020 in the Council:
- Committee Report Filed
- Committee Mark-up of B23-0148
On February 22, 2019 in the Council:
- Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0148 Published in the District of Columbia Register
On February 19, 2019 in the Council:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
- B23-0148 Introduced by Councilmembers Allen, and Cheh at Committee of the Whole
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 12
March 3, 2020: Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen)
- Yeas: 12
March 3, 2020: First Reading
- Yeas: 12