+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2021 in the Council:
- Act A24-0012 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002551, Expires on May 27, 2021
On March 4, 2021 in the Council:
- Returned from Mayor
On February 26, 2021 in the Council:
- Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0012, Expires on May 27, 2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Council:
- Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Feb 26, 2021
On February 2, 2021 in the Council:
- Legislative Meeting
On January 19, 2021 in the Council:
- Retained by the Council with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment
On January 5, 2021 in the Council:
- B24-0014 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary
+ − Vote
February 2, 2021: Final Reading, CC
- Yeas: 13
Details:
+
−
- Phil Mendelson: Yes
- Anita Bonds: Yes
- Elissa Silverman: Yes
- Charles Allen: Yes
- Robert C. White, Jr.: Yes
- Trayon White, Sr.: Yes
- Vincent Gray: Yes
- Brianne K. Nadeau: Yes
- Kenyan R. McDuffie: Yes
- Mary Cheh: Yes
- Brooke Pinto: Yes
- Christina Henderson: Yes
- Janeese Lewis George: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor